FL H3545 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for appropriation to compensate Mr. Companioni for injuries sustained as result of negligence of employee of City of Tampa; provides limitation on payment of fees & costs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relief/Ramiro Companioni/City of Tampa

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-28HouseDied in Civil Justice Subcommittee
2015-03-08HouseReferred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2015-03-03HouseIntroduced
2015-03-02HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S0056 (Same As) 2015-05-01 - Died in Special Master on Claim Bills

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback