FL H3535 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-23 - Now in Appropriations Committee
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-23 - Now in Appropriations Committee
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Underwater Veterans Memorial - Pinellas.
Title
Underwater Veterans Memorial - Pinellas
Sponsors
Rep. Larry Ahern [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-23 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2018-01-23 | House | Favorable by Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-19 | House | On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/23/18, 11:15 am, Reed Hall |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2017-12-05 | House | Referred to Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2017-11-28 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/3535 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/3535/BillText/Filed/PDF |