FL H3535 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for appropriation to compensate Jennifer Wohlgemuth for injuries & damages sustained as result of negligence of employee of Pasco County Sheriff's Office; provides limitation on payment of fees & costs.
Title
Relief/Jennifer Wohlgemuth/Pasco County Sheriff's Office
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2015-03-08 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-02-25 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0030 (Same As) 2015-05-01 - Died in Community Affairs
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/3535 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/3535/BillText/Filed/PDF |