FL H3525 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides appropriation to compensate Thomas & Karen Brandi for injuries & damages sustained as result of negligence of employee of Haines City; provides that appropriation settles all present & future claims relating to injuries & damages sustained by Thomas & Karen Brandi; provides limitation on payment of fees & costs.
Title
Relief/Thomas & Karen Brandi/Haines City
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2015-02-19 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0026 (Same As) 2015-04-15 - Unfavorable by Community Affairs, laid on Table; YEAS 2 NAYS 6
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/3525 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/3525/BillText/Filed/PDF |