FL H3505 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 17 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-13 - Added to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee Consent Agenda
Pending: House Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides an appropriation for the Hialeah Housing Authority (HHA) Elderly Affordable Housing - Hoffman Gardens Phase I.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hialeah Housing Authority (HHA) Elderly Affordable Housing - Hoffman Gardens Phase I

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-13HouseAdded to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee Consent Agenda
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-11-29HouseNow in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-11-29HouseReferred to Appropriations Committee
2021-11-29HouseReferred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-11-17HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback