FL H3479 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-04 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-04 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Light House Works Digital Accessibility Testing.
Title
Light House Works Digital Accessibility Testing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-04 | House | Died in Appropriations Committee |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-08 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2019-03-07 | House | Favorable by Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-05 | House | On Committee agenda-- Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/07/19, 9:00 am, Reed Hall |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-11 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/3479 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/3479/BillText/Filed/PDF |