FL H3417 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - See SB 2500 (line item 141)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - See SB 2500 (line item 141)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Lastinger Center Ensuring Access to Abuse Prevention and Trauma Informed Care Techniques for Florida Child Care and Instructional Personnel at UF.
Title
Lastinger Center Ensuring Access to Abuse Prevention and Trauma Informed Care Techniques for Florida Child Care and Instructional Personnel at UF
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-08 | House | See SB 2500 (line item 141) |
2017-05-05 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-02-23 | House | Referred to Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2017-02-16 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/3417 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/3417/BillText/Filed/PDF |