FL H3409 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 13 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides an appropriation for the 44th Avenue East Extension.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

44th Avenue East Extension

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-22HouseNow in Appropriations Committee
2020-01-22HouseFavorable by Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2020-01-17HouseOn Committee agenda-- Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/22/20, 12:30 pm, Sumner Hall
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2019-11-25HouseReferred to Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee
2019-11-13HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback