FL H3403 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Now in Appropriations Committee
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides an appropriation for the Brevard County Reentry Portal.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Brevard County Reentry Portal

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-13HouseNow in Appropriations Committee
2019-03-13HouseFavorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2019-03-11HouseOn Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/13/19, 12:30 pm, Morris Hall
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-02-13HouseReferred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee
2019-02-11HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback