FL H3389 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on November 17 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-12 - Now in Appropriations Committee
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides an appropriation for the Second Chance Program -17th Judicial Circuit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Second Chance Program -17th Judicial Circuit

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-12 - House - House Justice Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-12HouseNow in Appropriations Committee
2022-01-12HouseReported out of Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
2022-01-12HouseFavorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2022-01-10HouseAdded to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee Consent Agenda
2022-01-10HouseRemoved from Meeting Agenda of Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
2022-01-10HouseAdded to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
2021-11-24HouseNow in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-11-24HouseReferred to Appropriations Committee
2021-11-24HouseReferred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-11-17HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback