FL H3327 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Boca Raton Wastewater Treatment Plant Nutrient and Energy Reduction Enhancements.
Title
Boca Raton Wastewater Treatment Plant Nutrient and Energy Reduction Enhancements
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Caruso [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-13 - House - House Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Appropriations Committee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-13 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2022-01-13 | House | Reported out of Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-13 | House | Favorable by Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-11 | House | Added to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee Consent Agenda |
2021-11-24 | House | Now in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-11-24 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2021-11-24 | House | Referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-11-16 | House | Filed |