FL H3289 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 13 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - See HB 5001 (line item 3229)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides an appropriation for the Community Court Program - City of Fort Lauderdale.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Community Court Program - City of Fort Lauderdale

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-19HouseSee HB 5001 (line item 3229)
2020-03-14HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2019-12-20HouseNow in Appropriations Committee
2019-12-12HouseFavorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2019-12-05HouseOn Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 12/12/19, 4:00 pm, Reed Hall
2019-11-25HouseReferred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee
2019-11-13HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback