FL H3283 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-08 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-08 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Helping Hands - Services to At-Risk Youth.
Title
Helping Hands - Services to At-Risk Youth
Sponsors
Rep. Roy Hardemon [D] | Rep. Daisy Baez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-08 | House | Died in Appropriations Committee |
2017-05-05 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-22 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2017-03-21 | House | Favorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-17 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/21/17, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-02-23 | House | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2017-02-14 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/3283 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/3283/BillText/Filed/PDF |