FL H3249 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-10 - Now in Appropriations Committee
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-10 - Now in Appropriations Committee
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Coral Gables Regional Emergency Operations Center and Public Safety Building.
Title
Coral Gables Regional Emergency Operations Center and Public Safety Building
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-10 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2018-01-09 | House | Favorable by Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2018-01-05 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/09/18, 1:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2017-11-29 | House | Referred to Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2017-11-21 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/3249 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/3249/BillText/Filed/PDF |