FL H3241 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-04 - See SB 2500 (line item 2322A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-04 - See SB 2500 (line item 2322A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Latin Chamber of Commerce CAMACOL.
Title
Latin Chamber of Commerce CAMACOL
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-04 | House | See SB 2500 (line item 2322A) |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-08 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/3241 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/3241/BillText/Filed/PDF |