FL H3187 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-04 - See SB 2500 (line item 1657A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides an appropriation for the Collier County Plantation Island Hurricane Irma Waterway Recovery Project.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Collier County Plantation Island Hurricane Irma Waterway Recovery Project

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-04HouseSee SB 2500 (line item 1657A)
2019-05-03HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-06HouseNow in Appropriations Committee
2019-03-05HouseFavorable by Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-03-01HouseOn Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/05/19, 1:00 pm, Morris Hall
2019-02-13HouseReferred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee
2019-02-07HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback