FL H3163 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-26 - Now in Appropriations Committee
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-26 - Now in Appropriations Committee
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Palm Beach County Sheriff's Office Expansion of the Unmanned Aircraft System.
Title
Palm Beach County Sheriff's Office Expansion of the Unmanned Aircraft System.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-26 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2018-01-18 | House | Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-16 | House | On Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/18/18, 1:00 pm, Mashburn Hall |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2017-11-29 | House | Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2017-11-20 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/3163 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/3163/BillText/Filed/PDF |