FL H3137 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-08 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides an appropriation for the City of Coral Gables Cocoplum Area Drainage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

City of Coral Gables Cocoplum Area Drainage

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-08HouseDied in Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
2017-05-05HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2017-03-07HouseIntroduced
2017-02-23HouseReferred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee
2017-02-14HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback