FL H3101 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Florida State University - Florida Health Equity Research Institute.
Title
Florida State University - Florida Health Equity Research Institute
Sponsors
Rep. Kamia Brown [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-11-23 | House | Now in Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-11-23 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2021-11-23 | House | Referred to Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-11-15 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/3101 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/3101/BillText/Filed/PDF |