FL H3073 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Died in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Died in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Lucanus Developmental Center Website for Caregivers of Adult Down Syndrome Alzheimer's Patients.
Title
Lucanus Developmental Center Website for Caregivers of Adult Down Syndrome Alzheimer's Patients
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-19 | House | Died in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-11-25 | House | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2019-11-12 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/3073 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/3073/BillText/Filed/PDF |