FL H3017 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-04 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-04 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Florida Agricultural and Mechanical University Brooksville Agricultural and Environmental Research Station.
Title
Florida Agricultural and Mechanical University Brooksville Agricultural and Environmental Research Station
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-04 | House | Died in Appropriations Committee |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-12 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2019-03-12 | House | Favorable by Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-07 | House | On Committee agenda-- Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/11/19, 1:30 pm, Morris Hall |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-02-08 | House | Referred to Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/3017 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/3017/BillText/Filed/PDF |