FL H2993 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - See SB 2500 (line item 110)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - See SB 2500 (line item 110)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the First Tee Foundation "Comprehensive Health and Mentoring" Program for Disabled and At Risk Youth" (CHAMP).
Title
First Tee Foundation "Comprehensive Health and Mentoring" Program for Disabled and At Risk Youth" (CHAMP)
Sponsors
Sen. Bryan Avila [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-08 | House | See SB 2500 (line item 110) |
2017-05-05 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-08 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2017-03-08 | House | Favorable by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-03-06 | House | On Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/08/17, 12:00 pm, Reed Hall |
2017-02-23 | House | Referred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2017-02-13 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/2993 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/2993/BillText/Filed/PDF |