FL H2963 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-30 - See SB 2500 (line item 1607A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-30 - See SB 2500 (line item 1607A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Apalachicola Stormwater Pipe Relining and Backflow Devices.
Title
Apalachicola Stormwater Pipe Relining and Backflow Devices
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Shoaf [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | See SB 2500 (line item 1607A) |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-09 | House | Now in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-02-09 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2021-02-09 | House | Referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-02-03 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/2963 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/2963/BillText/Filed/PDF |