FL H2943 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-09 - Introduced
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-09 - Introduced
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Lauren's Kids 'Safer, Smarter Schools'.
Title
Lauren's Kids 'Safer, Smarter Schools'
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2017-12-06 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2017-12-06 | House | Favorable by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2017-11-29 | House | On Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee, 12/06/17, 4:00 pm, Reed Hall |
2017-11-29 | House | Referred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2017-11-16 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/2943 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/2943/BillText/Filed/PDF |