FL H2885 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - See SB 2500 (line item 1606A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - See SB 2500 (line item 1606A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the One Water Inc. Two Pilot Projects to Address Environmental Solutions for Water Statewide.
Title
One Water Inc. Two Pilot Projects to Address Environmental Solutions for Water Statewide
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-08 | House | See SB 2500 (line item 1606A) |
2017-05-05 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-02-23 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/2885 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/2885/BillText/Filed/PDF |