FL H2791 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on November 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-10 - Now in Appropriations Committee
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-10 - Now in Appropriations Committee
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Security Funding for Jewish Day Schools.
Title
Security Funding for Jewish Day Schools
Sponsors
Rep. Randy Fine [R] | Sen. Lori Berman [D] | Rep. Jason Fischer [R] | Rep. Jared Moskowitz [D] |
Rep. Emily Slosberg-King [D] | Rep. Richard Stark [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-10 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2018-01-10 | House | Favorable by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2018-01-08 | House | On Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/10/18, 9:00 am, Reed Hall |
2017-11-27 | House | Referred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2017-11-16 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/2791 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/2791/BillText/Filed/PDF |