FL H2761 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-04 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides an appropriation for the LaBelle Water Transmission Loop Project.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LaBelle Water Transmission Loop Project

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-04HouseDied in Appropriations Committee
2019-05-03HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-11HouseNow in Appropriations Committee
2019-03-11HouseFavorable by Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2019-03-07HouseOn Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/11/19, 11:00 am, Mashburn Hall
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-02-08HouseReferred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee
2019-02-05HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback