FL H2749 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - See SB 2500 (line item 1306)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - See SB 2500 (line item 1306)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Cuban American Bar Association Pro Bono Project, Inc.
Title
Cuban American Bar Association Pro Bono Project, Inc.
Sponsors
Rep. Jose Diaz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-08 | House | See SB 2500 (line item 1306) |
2017-05-05 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-14 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2017-03-14 | House | Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-10 | House | On Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/14/17, 2:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-02-15 | House | Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/2749 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/2749/BillText/Filed/PDF |