FL H2747 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-04 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides an appropriation for the Hendry Collegiate High School Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hendry Collegiate High School Program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-04HouseDied in Appropriations Committee
2019-05-03HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-06HouseNow in Appropriations Committee
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-03-04HouseFavorable by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2019-02-25HouseOn Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/04/19, 2:30 pm, Reed Hall
2019-02-08HouseReferred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee
2019-02-05HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback