FL H2713 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-30 - See SB 2500 (line item 397A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-30 - See SB 2500 (line item 397A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Nassau County Council on Aging - Hilliard Westside Senior Life Center & Adult Day Healthcare.
Title
Nassau County Council on Aging - Hilliard Westside Senior Life Center & Adult Day Healthcare
Sponsors
Rep. Cord Byrd [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | See SB 2500 (line item 397A) |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-04 | House | Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-02-04 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2021-02-04 | House | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-02-02 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/2713 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/2713/BillText/Filed/PDF |