FL H2707 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 15 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-10 - Now in Appropriations Committee
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides an appropriation for the Communities In Schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Communities In Schools

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-10HouseNow in Appropriations Committee
2018-01-10HouseFavorable by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2018-01-08HouseOn Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/10/18, 9:00 am, Reed Hall
2017-11-27HouseReferred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee
2017-11-15HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback