FL H2665 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 15 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-29 - CS by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Provides an appropriation for the Martin County Sheriff's Office Crisis Response Unit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Martin County Sheriff's Office Crisis Response Unit

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-29HouseCS by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time
2018-01-29HouseNow in Appropriations Committee
2018-01-26HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-01-17HouseCS by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2018-01-12HouseOn Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/17/18, 12:30 pm, Morris Hall
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-11-27HouseReferred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee
2017-11-15HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback