FL H2633 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Hillsborough County Septic to Sewer.
Title
Hillsborough County Septic to Sewer
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-04 | House | Now in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-02-04 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2021-02-04 | House | Referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-02-01 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/2633 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/2633/BillText/Filed/PDF |