FL H2633 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Introduced
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides an appropriation for the Homeless Veteran Housing Assistance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Homeless Veteran Housing Assistance

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-02-21HouseNow in Appropriations Committee
2019-02-21HouseFavorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2019-02-14HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/21/19, 10:30 am, Sumner Hall
2019-02-08HouseReferred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee
2019-02-05HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback