FL H2615 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Mental Health Support Services for Adults with Disabilities (Boca HabCenter).
Title
Mental Health Support Services for Adults with Disabilities (Boca HabCenter)
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Caruso [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-18 - House - House Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-18 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-18 | House | Reported out of Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-18 | House | Favorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-16 | House | Added to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee Consent Agenda |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-04 | House | Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-02-04 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2021-02-04 | House | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-02-01 | House | Filed |