FL H2615 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-10 - Now in Appropriations Committee
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-10 - Now in Appropriations Committee
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Apalachicola River Land Acquisition Cleanup & Redevelopment Project.
Title
Apalachicola River Land Acquisition Cleanup & Redevelopment Project
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-10 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2018-01-10 | House | Favorable by Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2018-01-08 | House | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/10/18, 3:30 pm, Morris Hall |
2017-11-27 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2017-11-14 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/2615 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/2615/BillText/Filed/PDF |