FL H2605 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-22 - Now in Appropriations Committee
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-22 - Now in Appropriations Committee
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Delray Beach Atlantic Dunes Park Coastal Dune Restoration and Water Quality Improvement Project.
Title
Delray Beach Atlantic Dunes Park Coastal Dune Restoration and Water Quality Improvement Project
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Hager [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-22 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2018-01-18 | House | Favorable by Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-16 | House | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/18/18, 1:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2017-11-27 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2017-11-14 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/2605 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/2605/BillText/Filed/PDF |