FL H2597 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on November 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-16 - Now in Appropriations Committee
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-16 - Now in Appropriations Committee
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for The Underline.
Title
The Underline
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-16 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2018-01-16 | House | Favorable by Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-11 | House | On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/16/18, 11:30 am, Reed Hall |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2017-11-27 | House | Referred to Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2017-11-14 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/2597 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/2597/BillText/Filed/PDF |