FL H2555 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-08 - See SB 2500 (line item 1234)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides an appropriation for the Community Violence Reduction Intiative.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Community Violence Reduction Intiative

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-08HouseSee SB 2500 (line item 1234)
2017-05-05HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2017-03-07HouseIntroduced
2017-02-15HouseReferred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee
2017-02-07HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback