FL H2547 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 14 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-22 - Now in Appropriations Committee
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides an appropriation for the Palm Beach Gardens Stormwater Maintenance, Repairs and Operation Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Palm Beach Gardens Stormwater Maintenance, Repairs and Operation Program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-22HouseNow in Appropriations Committee
2018-01-18HouseFavorable by Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2018-01-16HouseOn Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/18/18, 1:00 pm, Morris Hall
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-11-27HouseReferred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee
2017-11-14HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback