FL H2529 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-04 - See SB 2500 (line item 117)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides an appropriation for the Dedicated STEM Classroom for Marine Science.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dedicated STEM Classroom for Marine Science

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-04HouseSee SB 2500 (line item 117)
2019-05-03HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-02-21HouseNow in Appropriations Committee
2019-02-20HouseFavorable by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2019-02-13HouseOn Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/20/19, 8:30 am, 116 Knott Building
2019-02-06HouseReferred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee
2019-02-04HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback