FL H2513 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-10 - Now in Appropriations Committee
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides an appropriation for the Veteran's Treatment Court - Sarasota County.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Veteran's Treatment Court - Sarasota County

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-10HouseNow in Appropriations Committee
2018-01-10HouseFavorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2018-01-08HouseOn Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/10/18, 12:00 pm, Morris Hall
2017-11-27HouseReferred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee
2017-11-13HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback