FL H2503 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-16 - On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/18/18, 1:00 pm, Sumner Hall --Temporarily Postponed
Pending: House Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-16 - On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/18/18, 1:00 pm, Sumner Hall --Temporarily Postponed
Pending: House Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Town of Davie - Downtown Road Improvements.
Title
Town of Davie - Downtown Road Improvements
Sponsors
Rep. Evan Jenne [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-16 | House | On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/18/18, 1:00 pm, Sumner Hall --Temporarily Postponed |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2017-11-27 | House | Referred to Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2017-11-13 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/2503 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/2503/BillText/Filed/PDF |