FL H2479 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 1 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-13 - Now in Appropriations Committee
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides an appropriation for the Key Biscayne Stormwater Water Quality Treatment Technology Testing Initiative.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Key Biscayne Stormwater Water Quality Treatment Technology Testing Initiative

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-13 - House - House Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-13HouseNow in Appropriations Committee
2022-01-13HouseReported out of Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
2022-01-13HouseFavorable by Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2022-01-11HouseAdded to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee Consent Agenda
2021-11-09HouseNow in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-11-09HouseReferred to Appropriations Committee
2021-11-09HouseReferred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-11-01HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback