FL H2469 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 1 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-12 - Now in Appropriations Committee
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides an appropriation for the Hillsborough Community College Nursing and Allied Health Program Support.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hillsborough Community College Nursing and Allied Health Program Support

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-12 - House - House Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-12HouseNow in Appropriations Committee
2022-01-12HouseReported out of Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee
2022-01-12HouseFavorable by Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2022-01-10HouseAdded to Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee Consent Agenda
2021-11-09HouseNow in Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-11-09HouseReferred to Appropriations Committee
2021-11-09HouseReferred to Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-11-01HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback