FL H2449 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-19 - See HB 5001 (line item 63A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-19 - See HB 5001 (line item 63A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the University of Miami Medical Training and Simulation Laboratory.
Title
University of Miami Medical Training and Simulation Laboratory
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-19 | House | See HB 5001 (line item 63A) |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-11-13 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2019-11-13 | House | Favorable by Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2019-11-06 | House | On Committee agenda-- Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee, 11/13/19, 3:30 pm, Webster Hall |
2019-10-30 | House | Referred to Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2019-10-28 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/2449 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/2449/BillText/Filed/PDF |