FL H2441 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-04 - See SB 2500 (line item 1657A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-04 - See SB 2500 (line item 1657A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Venice - Stormwater Outfall Monitoring Phase 1.
Title
Venice - Stormwater Outfall Monitoring Phase 1
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-04 | House | See SB 2500 (line item 1657A) |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-06 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Favorable by Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-03-01 | House | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/05/19, 1:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-04 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/2441 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/2441/BillText/Filed/PDF |