FL H2423 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the St. Pete Beach Road Reconstruction.
Title
St. Pete Beach Road Reconstruction
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-19 | House | Died in Appropriations Committee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-12-11 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2019-12-10 | House | Favorable by Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2019-12-03 | House | On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee, 12/10/19, 12:30 pm, Reed Hall |
2019-10-30 | House | Referred to Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2019-10-24 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/2423 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/2423/BillText/Filed/PDF |