FL H2373 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-30 - See SB 2500 (line item 1300A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-30 - See SB 2500 (line item 1300A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Voices for Florida Open Doors Outreach Network.
Title
Voices for Florida Open Doors Outreach Network
Sponsors
Rep. Cord Byrd [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-11 - House - House Justice Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | See SB 2500 (line item 1300A) |
2021-03-11 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-11 | House | Reported out of Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-11 | House | Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-09 | House | Added to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee Consent Agenda |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-01 | House | Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-01-28 | House | Filed |