FL H2371 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-30 - See SB 2500 (line item 567A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-30 - See SB 2500 (line item 567A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Five Star Veterans Center Homeless Housing and Re-integration Project.
Title
Five Star Veterans Center Homeless Housing and Re-integration Project
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | See SB 2500 (line item 567A) |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-01 | House | Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-01-28 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/2371 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/2371/BillText/Filed/PDF |